skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 7:25:28 AM

Anawati, Michelle Lucienne

CPSO#: 92772

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Equipe de Sante Familiale
Communautaire de l'Est d'Ottawa
1811 St-Joseph Blvd
Orleans ON  K1C 7C6
Phone: (613) 590-0533
Fax: 613-590-7351 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: 613-858-3542
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHELLE LUCIENNE ANAWATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAWATI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012