skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 3:40:33 PM

Whitten-Stovall, Richard Frank

CPSO#: 92734

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jun 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Emory University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Clinic
Department of Psychiatry
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - North Dakota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013 Active
             Dr.  Richard  Frank  Whitten-Stovall  may  practise  medicine  independently in
            psychiatry, only.