skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:30:29 PM

Fayez, Rola Mahmoud M

CPSO#: 92402

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 08 Jan 2010 to 22 Jan 2010
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2010 to 07 Jul 2010
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jul 2010