skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:10:37 AM

Aljarallah, Badr Mohammed J

CPSO#: 92149

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jan 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011