skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 1:17:19 PM

Kukreti, Vinay

CPSO#: 92068

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Sep 2014
EXPIRY DATE
16 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Sep 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi, Urdu

Education:Gorakhpur University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

306-220 Dundas St W
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Canada
Phone: 9056659001
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. V. Kukreti and Dr. D. Mankad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kukreti ( CPSO# 92068 )
Dr. D. Mankad ( CPSO# 93183 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Sep 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2009 to 09 Oct 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Sep 2021

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 10 May 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Vinay Kukreti may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Pediatrics,  at  Queen's  University, in which Dr. Kukreti holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or when Dr. Kukreti no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Kukreti's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does not receive an annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Kukreti's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  September  17,  2014.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not  extended  by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 16, 2021.