skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 4:18:29 PM

John, Jijan

CPSO#: 92010

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:Bhopal University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Windsor Medical Centre
Suite 2
3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 3N9
Phone: (519) 969-3744
Fax: (519) 969-4478 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chrysler Canada Inc
2545 Chrysler Centre
Windsor ON  N8W 5M4
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-2001
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JIJAN JOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012