skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 4:12:49 PM

Shamloul, Rany Mohamed Mahmoud

CPSO#: 91867

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 28 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013