skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:34:56 AM

Tirado, Yamilet

CPSO#: 91782

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Puerto Rico, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011