skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 3:34:30 PM

AlHarfi, Ibrahim Mohammad Ali

CPSO#: 91310

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012