skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 10:03:09 AM

Barrington, Michelle Ruth

CPSO#: 90390

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jul 2007 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2017