skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:34:47 PM

Shogan, Ahmad Tayseer Kalimat

CPSO#: 90101

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Jordan, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
125 Trans-Canada Highway
Gander NL  A1V1P7
Phone: 709-2565740

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmad Shogan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 08 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AHMAD TAYSEER KALIMAT SHOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOGAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2008