skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:01:32 AM

Schweitzer, Mark Eliot

CPSO#: 89842

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State Univ of New York at Buffalo, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2013