skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 7:27:23 PM

Safir, Irina

CPSO#: 89739

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Dniepropetrovsk State Medical Academy, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uptown Health Centre
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Phone: (905) 508-8876
Fax: (905) 508-1087 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

243 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON  M4R 1B1
Canada
Phone: 416-489-2106
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Irina Safir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Safir ( CPSO# 89739 )

Business Address:
Uptown Health Centre
9325 Yonge Street
Suite 8
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Phone Number: (905) 508-8876

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IRINA SAFIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2010 to 27 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2011