skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 11:43:44 PM

Fournier-Gosselin, Marie-Pierre

CPSO#: 89649

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2009