skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 6:58:20 PM

Forrest, Jennifer Louise

CPSO#: 89444

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bristol, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 09 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009