skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/05/2019 11:14:40 PM

Purcell, Daniel Myron

CPSO#: 89422

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 788-3623
Fax: (705) 788-3624 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huntsville District Memorial
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Canada
Phone: (705) 789-2311
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Daniel Purcell & Rebecca Kent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kent ( CPSO# 88818 )
Dr. D. Purcell ( CPSO# 89422 )

Business Address:
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Business Address:
348 Muskoka Road 3 north
Suite 202
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 788-3623

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIEL MYRON PURCELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURCELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010