skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/05/2019 11:27:01 PM

Millard, Julie Anne

CPSO#: 89161

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6155 Coburg Road
Halifax
HAlifax NS  B3H 4K4
Phone: (902) 446-0556
Fax: (902)479-4674

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Julie A. Millard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 24 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE MILLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013