skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 11:16:33 PM

Hall, Melanie Erin

CPSO#: 89129

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Gateway Blvd
Brampton ON  L6T 4X2
Phone: 905-799-0096 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

2100 Bovaird Dr
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

20 Lynch St
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hall ( CPSO# 89129 )

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
25 Gateway Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 4X2
Phone Number: (289) 323-0660

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Mar 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELANIE ERIN HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2011