skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/05/2019 11:10:57 PM

Lui, Andrew Bor-Terng

CPSO#: 88942

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners -- M Site
100 The Queensway
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Trillium Health Partners -- Q Site
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 259-6671
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew B. Lui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lui ( CPSO# 88942 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6004

Business Address:
100 The Queensway
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (905) 848-7533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW BOR-TERNG LUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010