skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/09/2019 7:17:48 PM

Hall, Andrew Koch

CPSO#: 88606

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2368 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A.K. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hall ( CPSO# 88606 )

Business Address:
Royal College
774 Echo Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5N8
Phone Number: (613) 730-8177

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2368

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW KOCH HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013