skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:36:33 AM

Fedorak, Graham Todd McArthur

CPSO#: 88603

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 14 Jul 2009 to 13 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 14 Jul 2010 to 13 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 14 Jul 2011 to 13 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 14 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013