skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 9:09:50 AM

Chang, Michael Edward

CPSO#: 88444

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department of Emergency Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6115 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Garnett ( CPSO# 95471 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. M. Wiltshire ( CPSO# 65013 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. D. Yee ( CPSO# 59895 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. S. Chapman ( CPSO# 93976 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. D. Savage ( CPSO# 103493)
Dr. T. Lai ( CPSO# 103634)

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4


Corporation Name: Michael Edward Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department of Emergency Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6115

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL EDWARD CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2011