skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 1:42:09 PM

Kalidindi, Shiva Kumar Raju

CPSO#: 88319

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Tamil, Telugu

Education:Bangalore University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shiva Kalidindi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 May 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2013