skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 5:23:42 PM

Osawa, Hirokatsu

CPSO#: 88300

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Nagoya University School of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2008 to 18 Aug 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 2008 to 31 May 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2009