skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:00:19 AM

Erak, Drago

CPSO#: 88167

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drago Erak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Erak ( CPSO# 88167 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DRAGO ERAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 24 Mar 2008 to 08 May 2008
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2011