skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/09/2019 11:28:40 PM

Adelman, Karin Anne Ehrlich

CPSO#: 88124

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hebrew

Education:University of Massachusetts, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New Hampshire

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 May 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KARIN ANNE EHRLICH ADELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADELMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2008