skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:19:58 AM

Sabr, Yasser Saleh Saddiq

CPSO#: 88062

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 May 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Feb 2008 to 14 Feb 2008
PEAP - Resident - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Feb 2008 to 16 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 May 2008