skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 8:04:48 AM

Zilberman, Paul N

CPSO#: 88010

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 24 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008