skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/08/2019 10:49:59 PM

Hameed, Asiya

CPSO#: 87908

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Dec 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Dec 2007
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Bengali, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Aligarh Muslim University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Department Obstetrics & Gynaecology
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811 Ext. 4638
Fax: (905) 373-6996 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Asiya Hameed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hameed ( CPSO# 87908 )

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Department of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
Suite 2A-11
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 377-7796


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 17 Dec 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2009

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2009 Active
             Dr. Asiya Hameed may practise independently in the area of Obstetrics and
            Gynaecology only.