skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 3:41:10 PM

Le Tourneau, Christophe Dominique

CPSO#: 87847

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universite de Louis Pasteur, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 25 Dec 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 26 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009