skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:39:09 AM

Papoutsi, Ioanna

CPSO#: 87842

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Demokritos University of Thrace, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2007 to 22 Jan 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008