skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 7:16:24 AM

Cassis, Chantal

CPSO#: 87835

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2009