skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 4:56:06 PM

Poulin, Sacha

CPSO#: 87790

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Montfort Hospital 713 Montreal Road Ottawa, Ontario K1K 0T2
Date Received: 13 Jun 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 24 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Oct 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008