skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 6:52:29 AM

Purdy, Kerri Suzanne

CPSO#: 87616

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2007 to 25 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 08 Sep 2010 to 08 Oct 2010
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016