skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 6:51:18 AM

Gangam, Hema Malini

CPSO#: 87567

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Aug 2007
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 366
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 973-1133
Fax: (519) 973-1255 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. Gangam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Gangam ( CPSO# 87567 )

Business Address:
366 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 973-1133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 08 Aug 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Feb 2010

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2010 Active
             Dr. Hema Malini Gangam may practise medicine independently in Neurology, only.