skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:35:07 AM

Moran Mendoza, Angel Onofre

CPSO#: 87540

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Oct 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Autonoma de San Luis Potosi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Richardson House
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 548-1380
Fax: (613) 549-1459 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Onofre Moran Mendoza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moran Mendoza ( CPSO# 87540 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Richardson House
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 548-1380

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 22 Oct 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2014 Active
             Dr. Angel Onofre Moran Mendoza may practise independently in respirology, only.