skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 7:16:51 AM

Bouchard, Alexandre

CPSO#: 87249

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2008