skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 4:54:24 PM

Bahrabadi, Mehrdad

CPSO#: 87237

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008