skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:34:29 PM

Jang, Raymond Woo-Jun

CPSO#: 84667

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
OPG 7-718
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-6508
Fax: (416) 946-6546 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Raymond Jang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jang ( CPSO# 84667 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
OPG 7-718
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-6508

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAYMOND WOO-JUN JANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010