skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 7:05:37 PM

Narewal, Mondeep

CPSO#: 81393

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WRH Ouellette Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Curt Wimmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 24 2014
Corporation Name: Dr. Charlotte Logan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Narewal ( CPSO# 81393 )
Dr. C. Logan ( CPSO# 98425 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4401

Business Address:
Suite 106
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (226) 782-7246


Corporation Name: Dr. Curt Wimmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wimmer ( CPSO# 94455 )
Dr. M. Narewal ( CPSO# 81393 )

Business Address:
1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8

Business Address:
145 - 2475 McDougall Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9


Corporation Name: Dr. Mondeep Narewal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Narewal ( CPSO# 81393 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jul 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MONDEEP NAREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAREWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2013