skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 10:07:38 AM

Asaria, Jamil

CPSO#: 81200

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 May 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
251 Davenport Road
FACE
Toronto ON  M5R 1J9
Phone: (416) 479-4244
Fax: (416) 920-4244 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Asaria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Asaria ( CPSO# 81200 )

Business Address:
251 Davenport Road
Toronto ON  M5R 1J9
Phone Number: (416) 479-4244

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMIL ASARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASARIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2010