skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 4:27:58 PM

Henry, Richard Anthony

CPSO#: 63132

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 22 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Aug 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard Henry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827


Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 2 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1994
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 24 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 22 Jul 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 22 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 22 Jul 2019


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 22 Jul 2019 Active

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Jul 2019
Summary:

On July 22, 2019, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, the Discipline 
 Committee found that Dr. Richard Anthony Henry committed an act of professional misconduct, 
 in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
 regard to all circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS AND ADMISSION 

 Dr. Richard Anthony Henry (“Dr. Henry”) is a sixty-one (61) year-old anesthesiologist who 
currently practices in Kingston, Ontario. Dr. Henry received his certificate of registration 
authorizing independent practice in 1994. In addition to his anesthesiology practice, Dr. Henry 
has provided care and treatment to patients for acute and chronic pain.   
 
PATIENT A: DISGRACEFUL, DISHONOURABLE OR UNPROFESSIONAL 
CONDUCT 
 
Patient A was a patient of Dr. Henry’s from 2009 to 2015. In 2009, Patient A was referred to Dr. 
Henry for treatment of severe pelvic and hip pain. She initially saw Dr. Henry at the chronic pain 
clinic at St. Mary’s of the Lake Hospital in Kingston. In 2011, the pain clinic was relocated to 
Hotel Dieu Hospital (“HDH”). From September 2011 to October 2015, Patient A saw Dr. Henry 
at the chronic pain clinic at HDH in Kingston.   

Dr. Henry’s treatment of Patient A included pelvic floor injections, and trigger point local 
anesthetic injections to various pain sites in her body. These treatments were very painful for 
Patient A and she sometimes expressed her pain by making loud noises during the appointments.  

Over time, Dr. Henry became increasingly casual in his communications with Patient A. Dr. 
Henry and Patient A engaged in banter during the appointments which Patient A started to find 
was inappropriate. As she required treatment for chronic pain, she continued to attend 
appointments with Dr. Henry.  

On July 16, 2015, Patient A attended an appointment with Dr. Henry at the chronic pain clinic at 
HDH. During the appointment, Dr. Henry administered multiple trigger point injections into 
multiple pain sites in Patient A’s body, including her neck, shoulder area, thighs, and calves. A 
sheet covered areas of her body that were not being injected. A female nurse chaperone was 
present during the appointment.       

Patient A was sweating and felt overwhelmed by the injections. Patient A made loud guttural 
noises as a result of the pain she was experiencing.  

Dr. Henry and the nurse chaperone were standing together near the treatment table. At some 
point after Patient A made loud noises, Dr. Henry turned to the nurse and made an inappropriate, 
unprofessional, and crude comment regarding the noises Patient A was making.  Dr. Henry states 
he was attempting to make light of the situation. Patient A was shocked by Dr. Henry’s comment 
and was very uncomfortable.  

 
 
ADMISSION  
 
Dr. Henry admits the facts set out above, and admits, for the purposes of the College 
proceedings, that he engaged in professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or 
omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, under 
paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93, made under the Medicine Act, 1991. 
 
DISPOSITION 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered that: 
  -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Henry's certificate of registration for a period of two (2) 
     months, commencing immediately 
   -  The Registrar place the following  terms, conditions and  limitations on Dr. Henry's 
      certificate of registration: 
       i.   Dr. Henry shall comply with the College Policy #2-07 "Practice Management 
            Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practice, Take an Extended 
            Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation", a copy of 
            which is attached at Schedule "A"  to this Order; and 
       ii. Dr. Henry will participate in the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program 
           offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals, by 
           receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or 
           qualification. Dr. Henry will complete the PROBE program within 6 
           months of the date of this Order, and will provide proof to the College of 
           his completion, including proof of  registration and attendance and 
           participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. 
   -  Dr. Henry pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the 
      date of this Order.

Hearing Date(s): July 22, 2019 half day hearing 9:00 a.m. start time

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: May 7, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Richard Anthony Henry to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 7, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted Dr. Henry’s standard of practice and conduct in his chronic pain management practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Henry will engage in professional education in opioid prescribing.

Dr. Henry’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the completion of the professional education.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 7, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)