skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 9:41:15 AM

Vannelli, Antonio Michele

CPSO#: 55572

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences
Centre University Campus
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 33384 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vannelli and Regan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Regan ( CPSO# 55532 )
Dr. A. Vannelli ( CPSO# 55572 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANTONIO MICHELE VANNELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANNELLI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1986