skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 2:56:30 PM

Widjanarko, Djoen

CPSO#: 52126

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Indonesian

Education:Gadjah Mada University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health science North Sudbury
41 RAMSEY LAKE ROAD
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 8107
Fax: (705) 675-4780 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Widjanarko Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 51679 )
Dr. D. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 52126 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DJOEN WIDJANARKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIDJANARKO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1984