skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/09/2019 9:31:07 PM

Agarwal, Shashi

CPSO#: 50055

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jul 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Bhopal University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
suite 505
2300 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: 905 828 1027
Fax: 905 828 1509 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shashi Agarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Agarwal ( CPSO# 50055 )

Business Address:
505 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 828-1027


Corporation Name: Dr. Payal Agarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Agarwal ( CPSO# 50055 )
Dr. P. Agarwal ( CPSO# 96085 )

Business Address:
3rd Floor
77 Greenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Business Address:
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 595-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHASHI AGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1985