skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:32:08 AM

Butany, Vidya Jagdish

CPSO#: 42439

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjab University India, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
704-586 Eglinton Avenue
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone: (416) 544-0147
Fax: (416) 544-0261 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIDYA JAGDISH BUTANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTANY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991