skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 7:32:45 AM

Hanna, Maher Abdel-Aziz

CPSO#: 42410

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002