skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 6:44:41 AM

Bush, Haydn

CPSO#: 42396

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dynamic Medical Services 42673 Southdale Line St. Thomas ON N5R 1C1
Date Received: 06 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 20 Mar 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019