skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 10:46:37 PM

Patel, Surendra Ramanbhai

CPSO#: 42388

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Baroda University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Surendra Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: PO Box 65082 Merivale Nepean, ON K2G 5Y3
Instructions: Medical record requests may be made to the above address to the attention of Dr. Surendra Patel.
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018