skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 7:42:15 AM

Cooper, Alan Joseph

CPSO#: 42338

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Bluewater Health Department of Psychiatry 89 Norman Street Sarnia, ON N7T 6S3 Telephone: 519-464-4400
Date Received: 22 Dec 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2014